Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1151 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14557 Week
» 67573 Month
» 187100 Year
» 3213953 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2081 |
05/02/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03081 |
05/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/02/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/02/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2081 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G) |
|
|
08/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
28/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
04/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (50D) |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03081 |
|
|
01/06/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
12/10/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03081 |
|
|