Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2564 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15970 Week
» 68986 Month
» 188513 Year
» 3215366 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2061 |
20/06/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03061 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/06/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/06/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2061 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
25/02/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G) |
|
|
24/02/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03061 |
|
|
12/10/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03061 |
|
|
07/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|