Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 719 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14125 Week
» 67141 Month
» 186668 Year
» 3213521 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2055 |
01/05/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03055 |
05/01/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/05/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/05/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2055 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
25/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
08/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
08/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
26/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
05/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03055 |
|
|
30/06/1974 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03055 |
|
|
11/1974 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|