Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3550 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34200 Week
» 132845 Month
» 335509 Year
» 3362362 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1823 |
05/03/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47342 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
05/03/1965 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
02/1968 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/03/1965 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/03/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1823 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 585 Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
23/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47342 |
|
|
25/11/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47342 |
|
|
17/03/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|