Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 3496 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34146 Week
» 132791 Month
» 335455 Year
» 3362308 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1794 |
11/12/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47313 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
11/12/1964 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 04/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/12/1964 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 15/02/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/12/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1794 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 556 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
07/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
04/02/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
04/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47313 |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
28/02/2007 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47313 |
|
|
15/11/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury |
|
|