Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2440 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33090 Week
» 131735 Month
» 334399 Year
» 3361252 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1703 |
17/09/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47115 |
05/10/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
17/09/1965 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/11/1970 |
|
Reclassified from 48 to 47 |
|
|
|
|
07/11/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/09/1965 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
07/11/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
xbh |
Dual brakes, Steam heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/09/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1703 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 465 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
14/02/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
06/11/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 48 to 47 |
|
|
07/11/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
29/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
05/10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47115 |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
09/04/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47115 |
|
|
12/1995 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Frodingham Depot |
|
|