Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 806 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31456 Week
» 130101 Month
» 332765 Year
» 3359618 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1691 |
29/11/1963 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47103 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
29/11/1963 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 08/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 01/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1982 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/11/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
12/1982 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/11/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1691 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 453 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
12/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
27/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
01/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47103 |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
12/1982 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
14/07/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47103 |
|
|
07/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|