Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 2290 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 32940 Week
» 131585 Month
» 334249 Year
» 3361102 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1541 |
27/09/1963 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47429 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
27/09/1963 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
04/11/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
04/11/1972 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/09/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
04/11/1972 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/09/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1541 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 434 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
06/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
18/02/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
10/06/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
04/11/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
04/11/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
18/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47429 |
|
|
26/01/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47429 |
|
|
01/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by A Hampton: at Crewe Works |
|
|