Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 31 Online
» 2389 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15795 Week
» 68811 Month
» 188338 Year
» 3215191 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12137 |
17/01/1953 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/01/1953 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/01/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 12137 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to March (31B) |
|
|
18/04/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
13/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
11/05/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
03/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
06/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
18/11/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12137 |
|
|
11/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J E McMurray of Greenford: at Stratford MPD |
|
|