Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 83 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17886 Week
» 70902 Month
» 190429 Year
» 3217282 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12123 |
18/10/1952 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/10/1952 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/10/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 12123 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
18/02/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
22/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
25/06/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12123 |
|
|
11/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton |
|
|