|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Location | Report | Headcode | Reference |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
30/11/1947 | WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport | On G.W. waiting to pass through Swindon Shops. | Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
18/01/1964 | Darlington Works (Stripping Shop) | Erecting Shop: 12122, D191, D2615, D3143, D3672, D5102/9, D5370/6, and 0-4-0 Depl. Diesel No. 56, D7583-89 under construction. Steam Locos under repair: 75037, 60004, 60145, 60923/70, 73092/142/162, 75046/53, 90120/709. Stripping Shop: 47482 for general, 63451, 72002, 75006, 90209/578/728. Yard Sidings: D16, D2700, D5112, 43119, 60132, 61013, 60954, 62060/65, 63468, 65033/99, 65804, 73144, 75006/40, 90026. Diesel Test House: D22, D5104 an D5169. Scrap Yard: 43131, 42770, 61468, 65810, 67652, 68008/38/39/41/42/59/61, 68736, 69006/21 an 72001. | SLS/196402 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1945 | To Service | To service as WD Number 79307 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5250 |
||
08/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90728 | ||
05/08/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G) | ||
02/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G) | ||
09/12/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90728 | ||
01/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |