Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 755 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14161 Week
» 67177 Month
» 186704 Year
» 3213557 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
79305 |
m/e |
04/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3198 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63198 |
4w/e |
22/01/1949 |
British Railways |
90519 |
m/e |
02/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2313 |
Works Number |
5248 |
To Service |
During 04/1945 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 21/09/1964 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 5 mths , 21 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1945 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 79305 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5248 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3198 |
|
|
22/01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63198 |
|
|
02/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90519 |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
09/05/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barnsley (41G) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) |
|
|
07/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Canklow (41D) |
|
|
21/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
21/09/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90519 |
|
|
05/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|