Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 4220 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34870 Week
» 133515 Month
» 336179 Year
» 3363032 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
79304 |
m/e |
04/1945 |
British Railways |
90726 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2313 |
Works Number |
5247 |
To Service |
During 04/1945 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 12/11/1962 |
Service Life |
17 yrs, 7 mths , 12 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Sightings
Report Date |
Title |
Location |
Report |
Headcode |
Reference |
30/11/1947 |
WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport |
|
On G.W. waiting to pass through Swindon Shops. |
|
Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1945 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 79304 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5247 |
|
|
08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90726 |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G) |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G) |
|
|
12/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90726 |
|
|
02/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |
|
|