Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2652 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16058 Week
» 69074 Month
» 188601 Year
» 3215454 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
79269 |
m/e |
02/1945 |
British Railways |
90708 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2313 |
Works Number |
5212 |
To Service |
During 02/1945 |
Withdrawal |
During 04/1964 |
Service Life |
19 yrs , 2 mths |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
26A |
Newton Heath |
w/e |
26/11/1949 |
ALLOC |
9D |
Newton Heath |
4w/e |
02/05/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
02/05/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Sightings
Report Date |
Title |
Location |
Report |
Headcode |
Reference |
30/11/1947 |
WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport |
|
On G.W. waiting to pass through Swindon Shops. |
|
Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1945 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 79269 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5212 |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90708 |
|
|
03/12/1949 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26E) |
|
|
04/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90708 |
|
|
18/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) |
|
|
01/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Slag Reduction Co.: Ickles |
|
|