Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 741 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31391 Week
» 130036 Month
» 332700 Year
» 3359553 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
79241 |
m/e |
12/1944 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3191 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63191 |
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
British Railways |
90512 |
m/e |
02/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2308 |
Works Number |
5184 |
To Service |
During 12/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 16/09/1962 |
Service Life |
17 yrs, 9 mths , 17 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1944 |
NWE |
|
New England |
w/e |
26/11/1949 |
36C |
|
Frodingham |
4w/e |
19/09/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
16/09/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
ANN |
Annesley |
on |
29/06/1947 |
ALLOC |
CLK |
Colwick |
w/e |
18/10/1947 |
ALLOC |
NWE |
New England |
w/e |
26/11/1949 |
ALLOC |
36C |
Frodingham |
4w/e |
05/09/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 79241 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5184 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3191 |
|
|
26/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63191 |
|
|
26/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (NWE) |
|
|
02/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90512 |
|
|
19/09/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
16/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90512 |
|
|
11/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Gorton |
|
|