Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 740 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31390 Week
» 130035 Month
» 332699 Year
» 3359552 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
79229 |
m/e |
12/1944 |
British Railways |
90690 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2308 |
Works Number |
5172 |
To Service |
During 12/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 10/09/1962 |
Service Life |
17 yrs, 9 mths , 11 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1944 |
66A |
|
Polmadie |
4w/e |
16/01/1960 |
66B |
|
Motherwell |
4w/e |
16/06/1962 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
10/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1949 |
Eastfield MPD |
Class '8' 2-8-0 W.D. No. 90690 THJ was noted here -ex Cowlairs Works that evening, painted plain black, with no lettering, except the shed on the bufferbeam. Like all recent locomotives of this class ex shops, the number had been painted in white on the smoke-box door and also high up on the left-hand corner of the back of the tender. Inside the shed was Class '2P' No. 40609 lettered British Railways and lined out, being ex Cowlairs Works during W/E 26/2 and was being returned to Ardrossan shed that night; The old 30C shed plate was still being carried. 'L.1' No. 67764 was on shed here, having been returned from Hamilton to-day. |
SLS/194904 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 79229 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5172 |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90690 |
|
|
16/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
16/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
10/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90690 |
|
|
10/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |
|
|