Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1918 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15324 Week
» 68340 Month
» 187867 Year
» 3214720 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
79227 |
m/e |
12/1944 |
British Railways |
90688 |
m/e |
10/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2308 |
Works Number |
5170 |
To Service |
During 12/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 24/06/1967 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 6 mths , 25 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
15/10/1951 |
Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering |
Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. |
SLS/195111 |
19/09/1964 |
Darlington MPD (Shed) |
On shed-diesel bays: D5170/2, dead line: 69020, 90444/9; Roundhouse: D3228, D2706/31/2, D2318/36/40, D3229, DEPT87, 68011/37/43/7/50/3/60. Shed: 60024 ex works, 60036/45/808/84/5, 62001, 62002 ex works, 62003/43/4/8/64; 61030, 62368, 68010/4/46,151/4, 90011/4/98, 90361/556 ex works, 90688, 42405/77, 43050/6/7, 43102/29/40 and 63460 awaiting move to Stratford. |
SLS/196410 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 79227 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5170 |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|
17/09/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
10/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|
30/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
10/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90688 |
|
|
06/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
20/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (50D) |
|
|
24/06/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90688 |
|
|
01/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|