Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1382 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19185 Week
» 72201 Month
» 191728 Year
» 3218581 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
8684 |
m/e |
07/1944 |
War Dept. |
78684 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90648 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2300 |
Works Number |
5085 |
To Service |
During 07/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 30/08/1962 |
Service Life |
18 yrs , 2 mths |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 8684 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5085 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 78684 |
|
|
29/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
04/09/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90648 |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) |
|
|
31/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
13/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
15/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
13/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
15/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
30/08/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90648 |
|
|
09/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Gorton |
|
|