Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1965 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15371 Week
» 68387 Month
» 187914 Year
» 3214767 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
8680 |
m/e |
06/1944 |
War Dept. |
78680 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3158 |
m/e |
04/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63158 |
m/e |
Not applied |
British Railways |
90479 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2300 |
Works Number |
5081 |
To Service |
During 06/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 11/09/1966 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 3 mths , 11 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1946 |
General |
The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 |
SLS/194704 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 8680 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5081 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 78680 |
|
|
04/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3158 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 63158 but not taken up |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90479 |
|
|
05/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haverton Hill (51G) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
01/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
26/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
11/09/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90479 |
|
|
11/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|