Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 36 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17839 Week
» 70855 Month
» 190382 Year
» 3217235 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
8646 |
m/e |
05/1944 |
War Dept. |
78646 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3137 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63137 |
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
British Railways |
90458 |
m/e |
06/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2299 |
Works Number |
5047 |
To Service |
During 05/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 24/06/1967 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 1 mth , 25 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1946 |
General |
The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 |
SLS/194704 |
15/11/1947 |
Eastfield MPD |
On 15/11 No. 1255 was observed here with the wrong Maker's Plate (26157/47), while on 23/11 No. 1256 was seen with the same plates: Nos. 1255 and 1258 were both without plates on 23/11. On 7/12 No. 1067 KIT, which had been repainted green, was seen at Cowlairs West Junction being hauled from Cowlairs Works to Eastfield by 'J.83' No. 8475. On 17/12 No. 1244 Strang Steel HAY was here, being ex Cowlairs Works that day, after having had the nameplates fitted. This is believed to be the first Scottish Area 'B.1' to receive nameplates. On 1/1 No. 1243 EFD was noted here fitted with nameplates-Sir Harold Mitchell. The size of the letters appears to be smaller than that previously used, being between 21' and 3' high. Perhaps the most interesting 'foreigners' on the shed here on the same day were: Nos. 3041 ABD, 3137 HTN and 3190 TWD, the latter carrying both TWD and HTN on the buffer-beam. Nos. 77312 STM and 77313 THJ have been noted here recently, both carrying L.M.S. 15A shed plates, as well as their L.N.E. sheds stencilled or painted on the buffer-beam. Both these engines were regular visitors to Glasgow during the war-but on the L.M.S.-when working from 12A. It is very rare for N.E. Area Class '0.7's' or W.D.'s to appear at Eastfield. |
SLS/194802 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 8646 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5047 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 78646 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3137 |
|
|
21/08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63137 |
|
|
13/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) |
|
|
06/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90458 |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
22/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
20/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (50D) |
|
|
24/06/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90458 |
|
|
12/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|