Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 876 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14282 Week
» 67298 Month
» 186825 Year
» 3213678 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
8645 |
m/e |
05/1944 |
War Dept. |
78645 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3136 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63136 |
m/e |
Not applied |
British Railways |
90457 |
on |
25/05/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2299 |
Works Number |
5046 |
To Service |
During 05/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 05/01/1966 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 8 mths , 6 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 8645 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5046 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 78645 |
|
|
03/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3136 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 63136 but not taken up |
|
|
04/09/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
19/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) |
|
|
25/05/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90457 |
|
|
16/02/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Starbeck (50D) |
|
|
19/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (56D) |
|
|
11/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
05/01/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90457 |
|
|
05/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|