Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1410 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 32060 Week
» 130705 Month
» 333369 Year
» 3360222 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
78590 |
m/e |
11/1944 |
British Railways |
90385 |
m/e |
07/1950 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Sightings
Report Date |
Title |
Location |
Report |
Headcode |
Reference |
30/11/1947 |
WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport |
|
On G.W. waiting to pass through Swindon Shops. |
|
Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1944 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 78590 |
|
|
07/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90385 |
|
|
29/07/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
08/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B) |
|
|
31/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
02/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90385 |
|
|
06/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|