Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1404 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14810 Week
» 67826 Month
» 187353 Year
» 3214206 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
78577 |
m/e |
10/1944 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3092 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63092 |
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
British Railways |
90092 |
m/e |
10/1950 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1945 |
Austerities |
It is reported that 500 Austerity 2-8-0 locomotives are to be returned from the Continent and put into traffic on the British Railways, and it will be seen from the L.N.E.R notes, that some have arrived already. Those sent to March arrived with their packing in position and did not apear to have been in traffic overseas. It is believed that considerable dumps of these engines exist in this state and it is not impossible that the whole 500 have been surplus in this manner. We understand that the L.N.E.R. will receive 120 of them. 280 locos. of this class have been sold to the Netherlands State Railways. Belgium: Locomotives are allocated as follows: Merelbeke: 70877, 77079, 77178, 77289, 77381/8, 77292, 77468, 78528/77/84, 79222/30(Merelbeke). Ostend: 70864, 77278/8314, 78519/27/60/1/4/89(Ostend). Tournai: 77095, 77285, 77447, 79211(Tournai). Louven: 70823(Louven). Brussells (Midi): 70865(Brussels Midi). Ghent Zee-Haven: 75002/3/82, 75136(Ghent Zee-Haven). Schaerbeck: 71491, 75055(Schaerbeck). Stored at Ostend (6/45): 70865. 77021/31/7/69/82, 77117/51/4/6/75/83/9/91, 77236, 77344, 78527/64/89, 78619, 79238/46/51. The last-mentioned six are N.B. 25325/50/80 and V.F. 5181/9/94, all 1944. |
SLS/194602 |
31/12/1946 |
General |
The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 |
SLS/194704 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 78577 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25338 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3092 |
|
|
24/04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63092 |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) |
|
|
10/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90092 |
|
|
20/08/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
16/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
29/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
31/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
30/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (50D) |
|
|
13/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
11/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90092 |
|
|
01/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|