Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 549 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18352 Week
» 71368 Month
» 190895 Year
» 3217748 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7492 |
m/e |
02/1944 |
War Dept. |
77492 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90625 |
m/e |
02/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2292 |
Works Number |
5008 |
To Service |
During 02/1944 |
Withdrawal |
During 05/1967 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 2 mths , 30 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7492 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5008 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77492 |
|
|
02/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90625 |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
21/09/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
07/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) |
|
|
06/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
05/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90625 |
|
|
12/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|