Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2032 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19835 Week
» 72851 Month
» 192378 Year
» 3219231 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7474 |
m/e |
01/1944 |
War Dept. |
77474 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3113 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63113 |
m/e |
Not applied |
British Railways |
90434 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2292 |
Works Number |
4990 |
To Service |
During 01/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 27/06/1967 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 5 mths , 27 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1946 |
General |
The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 |
SLS/194704 |
28/11/1953 |
Darlington Works |
North Road have cut up 65022 an 65497 from E.R. also 'Sentinel' 8137 (still L.N.E.R. lettering and numbers). Waiting Works are: 68035/923/68/71, 61017/60/71, 61214/55, 61422, 62773, 63357/72, 63468, 67635/69, 67761/6/7, 69783, 90016/55/162/8/430/4/633/96. 67669 is dual fitted. 69783 has a chimney like the old A6 class carried. |
SLS/195402 |
13/08/1967 |
West Hartlepool MPD |
The following were on West Hartlepool on 13th August: 43015, 62026/41/2/4, 63344/87/94/7, 63407/31/5, 90061/74/6/116/210/30/54/309/39/47/60/434/59/78/92, 90627/77/95, D2068/77/8, D2153, D2205, D3137/9, D3672, D5152/65, D6756/63/6/9. |
SLS/196709 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7474 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4990 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77474 |
|
|
03/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3113 |
|
|
1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 63113 but not taken up |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) |
|
|
08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90434 |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
22/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
27/06/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90434 |
|
|
10/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|