Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3895 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17301 Week
» 70317 Month
» 189844 Year
» 3216697 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7470 |
m/e |
01/1944 |
War Dept. |
77470 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90614 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2292 |
Works Number |
4986 |
To Service |
During 01/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 29/11/1963 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 10 mths , 29 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1944 |
65F |
|
Grangemouth |
4w/e |
19/01/1963 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
29/11/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
17/05/1947 |
Eastfield MPD |
New 'B1' were much in evidence here, Nos. 1191/2 on 17/5, Nos. 1194/5 on 24/5, and Nos. 1193-1197 on 31/5. 'Austerity' 2-8-0 No. 77367 was noted on 17/5, not re-numbered L.N.E. No. 3019 as stated in the Journal. (Officially given by the Co. as re-numbered to 3019 on 2/2/47.-Editor). Further 'Austerity' 2-8-0 noted here during the month ended 31/5 were: Nos. 77078, 77225, 71306, 77456, 77470 and 78568; also '07' Nos. 3020, 3089, and 3120. All appeared to be awaiting shop repair. (K.M.). |
SLS/194708 |
30/08/1961 |
Cowlairs Works (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: D2708/70/4, 44783, 45213, 45361, 61324/46/96, 65919, 80030, 90017, 90386, 90463, 90614. Valve Shop: 73077. Stripping Shop: 65923. Weigh House: 64847. Paint Shop: 73099. Works Yard: D2434, D2726, D3393, 44485, 61178, 64932, 72009, 73005, 80045, 90753. Scrap Yard: 64710 intact, 64700 being out-up. Works Shunters: D2760, D3418. |
SLS/196110 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7470 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4986 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77470 |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90614 |
|
|
19/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
29/11/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90614 |
|
|
06/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |
|
|