Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1459 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14865 Week
» 67881 Month
» 187408 Year
» 3214261 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7445 |
m/e |
02/1944 |
War Dept. |
77445 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90309 |
m/e |
11/1951 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
15/10/1951 |
Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering |
Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. |
SLS/195111 |
13/08/1967 |
West Hartlepool MPD |
The following were on West Hartlepool on 13th August: 43015, 62026/41/2/4, 63344/87/94/7, 63407/31/5, 90061/74/6/116/210/30/54/309/39/47/60/434/59/78/92, 90627/77/95, D2068/77/8, D2153, D2205, D3137/9, D3672, D5152/65, D6756/63/6/9. |
SLS/196709 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7445 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25303 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77445 |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|
17/09/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
10/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|
29/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) |
|
|
11/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90309 |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
21/09/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Normanton (55E) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
16/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
29/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
26/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
01/07/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90309 |
|
|
10/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|