Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 322 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18125 Week
» 71141 Month
» 190668 Year
» 3217521 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7398 |
m/e |
11/1943 |
War Dept. |
77398 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90277 |
m/e |
07/1950 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Sightings
Report Date |
Title |
Location |
Report |
Headcode |
Reference |
30/11/1947 |
WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport |
|
On G.W. waiting to pass through Swindon Shops. |
|
Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service |
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/12/1965 |
Doncaster MPD |
Stored: 61085, 61135, 61326, 63738, 90203/59/77, 90349/93, 90432/54/76, 90501/16/28, 90629, 92190. |
SLS/196601 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7398 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25268 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77398 |
|
|
07/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90277 |
|
|
29/07/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B) |
|
|
08/09/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D) |
|
|
06/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C) |
|
|
12/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
31/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90277 |
|
|
03/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|