|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
18/01/1964 | Darlington Works (Yard Sidings) | Erecting Shop: 12122, D191, D2615, D3143, D3672, D5102/9, D5370/6, and 0-4-0 Depl. Diesel No. 56, D7583-89 under construction. Steam Locos under repair: 75037, 60004, 60145, 60923/70, 73092/142/162, 75046/53, 90120/709. Stripping Shop: 47482 for general, 63451, 72002, 75006, 90209/578/728. Yard Sidings: D16, D2700, D5112, 43119, 60132, 61013, 60954, 62060/65, 63468, 65033/99, 65804, 73144, 75006/40, 90026. Diesel Test House: D22, D5104 an D5169. Scrap Yard: 43131, 42770, 61468, 65810, 67652, 68008/38/39/41/42/59/61, 68736, 69006/21 an 72001. | SLS/196402 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1943 | To Service | To service as WD Number 7382 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25255 |
||
01/1945 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 77382 | ||
03/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3026 | ||
31/07/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 63026 | ||
04/09/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
06/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90026 | ||
17/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
10/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
25/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B) | ||
04/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
11/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B) | ||
17/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B) | ||
20/07/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
12/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
09/12/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90026 | ||
01/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |