Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1138 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18941 Week
» 71957 Month
» 191484 Year
» 3218337 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7357 |
m/e |
09/1943 |
War Dept. |
77357 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3016 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63016 |
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
British Railways |
90016 |
m/e |
09/1950 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1946 |
General |
The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 |
SLS/194704 |
28/11/1953 |
Darlington Works |
North Road have cut up 65022 an 65497 from E.R. also 'Sentinel' 8137 (still L.N.E.R. lettering and numbers). Waiting Works are: 68035/923/68/71, 61017/60/71, 61214/55, 61422, 62773, 63357/72, 63468, 67635/69, 67761/6/7, 69783, 90016/55/162/8/430/4/633/96. 67669 is dual fitted. 69783 has a chimney like the old A6 class carried. |
SLS/195402 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7357 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25222 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77357 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3016 |
|
|
17/04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63016 |
|
|
09/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90016 |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
28/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
08/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) |
|
|
21/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
27/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
26/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
31/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (50D) |
|
|
24/06/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90016 |
|
|
11/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|