30/06/1949 |
Brighton Works |
No. 36001, the first of the 'Leader' Class (0-6-6-0T) was outside the Works for the first time, in steam, on 21/6. The top casing was grey and the underframes and casings black. It is understood that this Class and also the new 'Battle of Britain' batch (34091 upwards) will normally be finished in lined black as for mixed traffic engines. The latest 2-8-0 repaired and re-numbered is No. 90718 (ex 79281). No. 2039 Hartland Point is in the repair shop, but its fate is uncertain: it is believed that the boiler is about worn out. Other engines recently shopped are Nos. 32488 (ex S2488), 90107 (ex 77007), 90678 (ex 79210), 32083 (plain black-so far), 90226 (ex 77311), 32536. 32576. |
SLS/194907 |
02/01/1951 |
Ashford Works |
New diesels, 15226 running trials, 15227 nearly ready; a large diesel complete in the paint shop. Ex shops: lined black 31770, 31800, 32576; unlined 31719, 32412, 90164; slight repairs 31263, 31543, 32167. In shops: 31027, 1279/94, 31321, 31400/11/92, 31712, 1735, 31771, 31827/37/48/53, 31903, 32434 (2 domes), 32488, 32539/83, 33003/32/36, 90678. Waiting shops: 31160/79, 31511, 31736, 31819, 78597, 90226, 90564. On scrap road: 1231, 31597/8, 31604. |
SLS/195102 |
28/02/1951 |
Southern Region WD\'s |
There seem to be 32 8F/2-8-0/WD on the Southern Region: 90127 an 77150 (73C), 90164 (73B), 90213 (73C), 90194 an 90216/26/34 (73B), 90247 (75A), 90254 (73H), 90257/67 (70B), 90317/60 (75B), 90389, 78597 (73C), 90408/533/552 (73B), 77090 (73C), 90558 (73B), 90562 (70B), 77101 (73B), 90566 (73C), 90570/604 (70B), 90641 (75B), 90669/71/78/702/18 (73C). The numbers are given in order of their B.R. numbers. Of the remainder, the Scottish Region has 89, the North-Eastern 122, the L.M.R. 197 and the Eastern Region 263; though occasional transfers still take place between the Regions. The Scottish Region also has the 2-10-0 engines (series 90750-90774) except one which is allotted to the C.M.E. at Rugby. |
SLS/195104 |
05/03/1951 |
Ashford Works (In yard) |
In shops: s1178, 1245, 1252, 31320, 31401/5, 31509, 31616, 31753/75/85, 31820/6/48, s1825, s1871, 32169, 2487, 32502/4/43, 33005/23/8, 78597. In yard : 1107, 1157, 31502/19/21/32, 1714/30, 31745, 31925, 32402, 2447, 32525, 32523/94, 33039, 90226. For scrap : 1443, 1547, 32301, 32584. Recently ex shops: lined black 31305, 31611, 31766/97, 31822, 32492, 32583. No. 32553 ('C2x') has left Ashford after general overhaul, with two domes. There are still a number of boilers so fitted which are inter-changed from time to time, though the second dome has served no purpose since the top-feed arrangement with which it was associated by the L. B.& S.C.R. was discontinued in 1930 under Southern auspices. The ranks of the famous 'I.3' tanks are being rapidly depleted since the advent of the new Class 4 MT Tanks. |
SLS/195104 |
28/03/1951 |
Ashford Works (In shops) |
In shops: 1107, 31245 (late s1245), s1274, 31287, 31329, 31413, 31510, 31812/26/62, 31900/23/25, 32372 (new cyls.), 32502 (lined black), s2473 (being renumbered), 32467, 32525/65, 78597, 90226, 33039. In yard: s1178, 1335, 31789 (green), 31897, 33025, 31616, 31848. On shed for works 1174, 31408, 31461, 32486 (and 30793 for ELH). Scrap: 1157, 31160 (partly cut up), 1547, 1730, 31743, 31502, 32402, and being cut up 1443 an 32301. Building Shunting diesel-electric 15228-30 and a main-line diesel 10203. Twenty sets of frames for 4-6-2 to be built at Crewe, also many sets of all-welded side tanks for new B.R. standard 2-6-4T to be built at Brighton. Noted not renumbered: 1041, 1271, 1339, 1379. Ex shops 32523 (1 dome), 31405, 31785 (green), 31521, and lined black 31401 an 31825 (late s1825) |
SLS/195108 |
20/05/1951 |
Locos renumbered |
S.R. 2170 was renumbered 32170 in mid-May, and diesel sl will shortly be turned out as 15201. Thus the S.R. diesels have become 15201-15203 instead of 15200-15202 as originally ordained. The Southern Region has lost two more W.D., 2-8-0 to the L.M.R., 90226 from 73B and 90390 from 73C. No. 77150 has now become 90142, so that all remaining on the S.R. are now renumbered with the possible exception of 77226 (90194). |
SLS/195107 |