Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 4328 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17734 Week
» 70750 Month
» 190277 Year
» 3217130 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7241 |
m/e |
11/1943 |
War Dept. |
77241 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90205 |
on |
27/02/1952 (at Swindon Factory) |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/05/1947 |
Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works |
W.D. locos. which have been repaired at these Works can readily be distinguished from those which have passed through Swindon, as they are painted all black, with red buffer beams and plain lettering. The following are amongst those which have been dealt with here: Nos. 77026, 77053, 77079, 77097, 77106, 77123, 77184, 77202. 77210, 77214, 77241, 77247, 77257, 77289. 77380, 77388, 78522, 78566, 78717 and 79244. |
SLS/194708 |
15/10/1951 |
Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering |
Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. |
SLS/195111 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1943 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7241 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77241 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newton Abbot (NA) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
27/02/1952 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90205 |
|
|
27/03/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury (26D) |
|
|
21/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E) |
|
|
25/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury (9M) |
|
|
07/03/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90205 |
|
|
11/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Albert Looms: Spondon |
|
|