|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Location | Report | Headcode | Reference |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
30/11/1947 | WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport | On G.W. waiting to pass through Swindon Shops. | Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
17/08/1947 | Stratton Park | The following 'Austerity' 2-8-0 were noted at Stratton Park dump (a few miles on the London side of Swindon) on 17/8 awaiting works:-70829, 77141, 77237, 77368, 77394, 77399, 78621, 78624, 79254, 79273 and 79294, whilst 79303 was actually outside Swindon Works. | SLS/194709 |
08/01/1961 | Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) | Paint Shop: D77/8, D83/5, D3921, 42179, 45063/8, 45646/95, 48755, L.N.W.R. 1054 and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D74/5/9, D80/2/4, 44767, 45132, 45201, 45348, 45667, 46457, 48529, 48600, 70032, 90346. Works Sidings: 40161, 44697, 44734/82, 44867, 44936, 45336, 45428, 46235, 46430, 49158/99, 49270, 49432, 70021, 84015, 92092, 92160/7. Erecting Shop: D90-6, 42476, 42580, 44869, 45037/48, 45197, 45219/40/50/77/94, 45302/44, 45411/9, 45506/78/82, 45616/38/54/75/80, 46203/9/47/50/5, 46410/36, 48054, 48120/73, 48255, 48438, 48635/68, 48898, 49281, 70033, 90137/8/57/97, 90203/33/51, 90316, 90509, 92018/33/43, 92134/55/65. Outside Erecting Shop: 42295, 45515/60, 46103/36/7, 48508, 49034, 90297, 92048. New Erecting Shop: D76, D81/6-9, D97-102. Cutting-up Shop: Nil. | SLS/196102 |
10/12/1965 | Doncaster MPD | Stored: 61085, 61135, 61326, 63738, 90203/59/77, 90349/93, 90432/54/76, 90501/16/28, 90629, 92190. | SLS/196601 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1943 | To Service | To service as WD Number 7237 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25108 |
||
01/1945 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 77237 | ||
04/1951 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90203 | ||
17/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
22/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
24/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
22/09/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
16/03/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
19/07/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
25/05/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Canklow (41D) | ||
19/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
17/10/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90203 | ||
04/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Arnott Young: Dinsdale |