Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2020 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19823 Week
» 72839 Month
» 192366 Year
» 3219219 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7175 |
m/e |
07/1943 |
War Dept. |
77175 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90160 |
on |
09/12/1950 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1945 |
Austerities |
It is reported that 500 Austerity 2-8-0 locomotives are to be returned from the Continent and put into traffic on the British Railways, and it will be seen from the L.N.E.R notes, that some have arrived already. Those sent to March arrived with their packing in position and did not apear to have been in traffic overseas. It is believed that considerable dumps of these engines exist in this state and it is not impossible that the whole 500 have been surplus in this manner. We understand that the L.N.E.R. will receive 120 of them. 280 locos. of this class have been sold to the Netherlands State Railways. Belgium: Locomotives are allocated as follows: Merelbeke: 70877, 77079, 77178, 77289, 77381/8, 77292, 77468, 78528/77/84, 79222/30(Merelbeke). Ostend: 70864, 77278/8314, 78519/27/60/1/4/89(Ostend). Tournai: 77095, 77285, 77447, 79211(Tournai). Louven: 70823(Louven). Brussells (Midi): 70865(Brussels Midi). Ghent Zee-Haven: 75002/3/82, 75136(Ghent Zee-Haven). Schaerbeck: 71491, 75055(Schaerbeck). Stored at Ostend (6/45): 70865. 77021/31/7/69/82, 77117/51/4/6/75/83/9/91, 77236, 77344, 78527/64/89, 78619, 79238/46/51. The last-mentioned six are N.B. 25325/50/80 and V.F. 5181/9/94, all 1944. |
SLS/194602 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7175 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25046 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77175 |
|
|
15/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
09/12/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90160 |
|
|
13/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (50D) |
|
|
25/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
08/06/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90160 |
|
|
28/02/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|