|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/11/1953 | Darlington Works | North Road have cut up 65022 an 65497 from E.R. also 'Sentinel' 8137 (still L.N.E.R. lettering and numbers). Waiting Works are: 68035/923/68/71, 61017/60/71, 61214/55, 61422, 62773, 63357/72, 63468, 67635/69, 67761/6/7, 69783, 90016/55/162/8/430/4/633/96. 67669 is dual fitted. 69783 has a chimney like the old A6 class carried. | SLS/195402 |
14/07/1962 | Darlington MPD (Ex Works) | Stored: 43070 (51L), 43101 (51L), 65768, 65772, 65773, 69002 (51A), 78015 (51J). Ex Works: 43014 (50A), 43125 (50B), 60834 (62B), 60944 (52B), 60973 (63A), 62004 (51A), 63389 (51L), 68043 (51A), 90011 (51A), 90273 (51L), 90430 (51A), 92098 (52H). Awaiting Works: 42639 (50F), 43134 (66D), 46494 (31A), 60818 (64A), 64706 (52G), 64713, 64730 (51L), 64757 (51L), 64758 (51L), 64821 (51L), 64835 (51F), 64848 (51F), 64982 (51F), 65670, 65761, 65776. Visitors : D12 (55H), 42553 (50A), 60040 (52A). | SLS/196209 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1943 | To Service | To service as WD Number 7133 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4949 |
||
01/1945 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 77133 | ||
02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3109 | ||
30/10/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 63109 | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
19/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
06/1951 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90430 | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
22/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
14/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (51E) | ||
20/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
26/01/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
15/07/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Normanton (55E) | ||
09/09/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90430 | ||
04/1968 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |