Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1439 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19242 Week
» 72258 Month
» 191785 Year
» 3218638 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7112 |
m/e |
10/1943 |
War Dept. |
77112 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3106 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63106 |
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
British Railways |
90427 |
on |
23/12/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2291 |
Works Number |
4928 |
To Service |
During 10/1943 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 24/06/1967 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 8 mths , 25 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7112 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4928 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77112 |
|
|
03/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3106 |
|
|
30/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63106 |
|
|
23/12/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90427 |
|
|
05/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
14/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
06/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
30/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (50D) |
|
|
24/06/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90427 |
|
|
01/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|