Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 880 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14286 Week
» 67302 Month
» 186829 Year
» 3213682 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7054 |
m/e |
05/1943 |
War Dept. |
77054 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90525 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2289 |
Works Number |
4870 |
To Service |
During 05/1943 |
Withdrawal |
During 04/1964 |
Service Life |
20 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
26A |
Newton Heath |
w/e |
26/11/1949 |
ALLOC |
9D |
Newton Heath |
4w/e |
02/05/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
02/05/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1947 |
W.D. \"Austerity\" 2-8-0\'s |
Position as at 31/12/47: By 31/12/47 the 700 W.D. 2-8-0's allocated to the Brtish Railways had all arrived in this country. The L.N.E.R. have their full 478 (i.e. original allocation of 410 plus 68 additional, vice 68 '0.6's' to the L.M.S.), and the Southern have their 50. The G.W.R. have 165 out of their total allocation of 172, the other 7 being at Harwich. The seven at Harwich are:-Nos. 70809, 70814, 70838, 70864, 77054, 78595, 79214. Of the 165 shown as 'on the G.W.R. system,' 89 are in traffic and the other 76 at Kingham and Marston. These 76 are officially classified as 'stabled awaiting heavy repair,' although it is believed that some of them have already been repaired in Belgium. The table below illustrates the final stages of the movement of W.D. 2-8-0's. TABLE REQUIRED HERE: Allocation On System 20/11/47 On System 18/12/47 On System 31/12/47 G.W.R. 172 157 161 165 L.N.E.R. 478 477 478 478 S.R. 50 50 50 50 Harwich 2 5 *7 Total in U.K. 700 686 694 700*For Western Region |
SLS/194804 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7054 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4870 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77054 |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90525 |
|
|
03/12/1949 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26E) |
|
|
04/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90525 |
|
|
18/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) |
|
|
01/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Slag Reduction Co.: Ickles |
|
|