|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 03/08/1957 | 07/09/1957 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 13/02/1958 | 08/03/1958 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 18/06/1959 | 02/07/1959 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 25/07/1960 | 27/08/1960 | 34 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 22/02/1962 | 02/03/1962 | 9 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
05/03/1961 | Crewe Works (Erecting Shops) | Paint Shop: D90/5, 41247/50/5/7/9/64/82, 45228, 45658, 48686, 48733, L.N.W.R. 1054, and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D86/9/91-3, 44768, 48470. 48693, 49395, 84012. Works Sidings: 42584, 42678, 44665, 44868, 45101/90/8, 45205/64, 45391, 45500/4, 45612, 46101/64, 47271, 47672, 48101/22, 48437, 48628/57, 48734, 49149/73, 49335, 78030/4/64, 90313/43, 92009, 92159. Erecting Shops: D94/100-7, 41203/26, 42086, 42557/67, 42657/86, 44664/91, 44738/73, 44802/22/40, 44917, 45062/95, 45106/13/6/48/85, 45217/38/41/57, 45302/14/39/72/92, 45425/46, 45514, 45629/45/98, 45702/8, 46139/44, 46231, 47008, 48345, 48502, 48659, 49122, 49431, 70042, 71000, 90064, 90110, 90207/92, 90399, 90544/79/84, 92046/69. Outside Erecting Shops: 45000/15, 45533, 46421, 48895, 49328, 49448, 92135. New Erecting Shop: D96-9/108/9. Outside New Erecting Shop: D110. Scrap Road: 40001, 42397, 42438, 43194, 43333, 43562, 49243, with 45511 just cut-up. Leaving Works: 45341, 45613, 48705, 92087. Works Shunters: 12020, 44373/4, 47592, 47618, 51412/46, 52312, 52441/64. | SLS/196104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1944 | To Service | To service as WD Number 842 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24914 |
||
01/1945 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 70842 | ||
03/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3064 | ||
01/05/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 63064 | ||
05/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
01/1951 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90064 | ||
24/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
29/01/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
03/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1957. Dep: 07/09/1957. | ||
13/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/02/1958. Dep: 08/03/1958. | ||
09/05/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (41G) | ||
18/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/06/1959. Dep: 02/07/1959. | ||
20/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
25/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/07/1960. Dep: 27/08/1960. | ||
22/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/02/1962. Dep: 02/03/1962. | ||
08/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Canklow (41D) | ||
15/01/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90064 | ||
03/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |