Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 926 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18729 Week
» 71745 Month
» 191272 Year
» 3218125 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
822 |
m/e |
04/1944 |
War Dept. |
70822 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3052 |
on |
16/02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63052 |
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
British Railways |
90052 |
m/e |
04/1950 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 822 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25164 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 70822 |
|
|
16/02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3052 |
|
|
15/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63052 |
|
|
29/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) |
|
|
11/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
04/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90052 |
|
|
21/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
30/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
21/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (38B) |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
22/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) |
|
|
19/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
09/05/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barnsley (41G) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) |
|
|
26/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Canklow (41D) |
|
|
05/03/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90052 |
|
|
04/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton |
|
|