Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 4286 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13860 Week
» 78814 Month
» 281478 Year
» 3308331 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
9675 |
on |
10/03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
378 |
To Service |
Fri 10/03/1949 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 01/10/1965 |
Service Life |
16 yrs, 6 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/03/1949 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 9675 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
04/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) |
|
|
22/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
16/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88B) |
|
|
08/08/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
01/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9675 |
|
|
12/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|