Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 680 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14086 Week
» 67102 Month
» 186629 Year
» 3213482 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
9647 |
on |
18/05/1946 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
356 |
To Service |
Wed 18/05/1946 to Exeter (EXE) |
Withdrawal |
Wed 16/06/1965 |
Service Life |
19 yrs , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1965 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
83B |
Taunton |
4w/e |
21/04/1951 |
ALLOC |
83D |
Exmouth Junction |
3w/e |
14/09/1964 |
ALLOC |
83G |
Templecombe (S&D) |
4w/e |
13/06/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/06/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
11/07/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
19/08/1962 |
Wolverhampton Works (In Works) |
In Works: 1020, 1630, 3615, 3721, 4636, 4697, 4703, 5181/4, 5564, 6160, 6614/8, 7739, 7816, 8104, 9422/70, 9613/24/6/47/65, 82008; Weigh house: 6156; Awaiting works: 3217, 4938/61, 5065, 5658, 7002, 7824, 9415. |
SLS/196209 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/05/1946 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 9647 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Exeter (EXE) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Exeter (EXE) |
|
|
21/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Taunton (83B) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Taunton (83B) |
|
|
12/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D) |
|
|
13/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (83G) |
|
|
16/06/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9647 |
|
|
10/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|