Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 401 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14444 Week
» 79398 Month
» 282062 Year
» 3308915 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D9547 |
20/07/1965 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/07/1965 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/07/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D9547 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) |
|
|
30/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
09/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
01/04/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9547 from Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
08/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by British Steel Corporation: at Corby |
|
|