Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 239 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6023 Week
» 27412 Month
» 146939 Year
» 3173792 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D9539 |
09/04/1965 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/04/1965 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/04/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D9539 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
20/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
31/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
01/04/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9539 from Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|