Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 614 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6398 Week
» 27787 Month
» 147314 Year
» 3174167 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D9513 |
06/10/1964 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
14 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
To Service |
06/10/1964 to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
Withdrawn |
10/03/1968 |
Time in Service |
3 yrs, 5 mths , 4 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/10/1964 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/10/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D9513 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
31/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
30/06/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
10/03/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9513 |
|
|