Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 683 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6467 Week
» 27856 Month
» 147383 Year
» 3174236 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D9504 |
08/08/1964 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/08/1964 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/08/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D9504 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
29/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
01/04/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9504 from Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
30/12/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|