Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 4299 Today
» 5422 Yesterday
» 25333 Week
» 123978 Month
» 326642 Year
» 3353495 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
9488 |
on |
31/12/1952 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/12/1952 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 9488 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 7639 Allocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
03/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
05/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
02/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
|
|
30/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G) |
|
|
20/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88B) |
|
|
30/04/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9488 |
|
|
07/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|