29/10/1961 |
Caerphilly Works (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: 1420/71, 1506, 1651/68 3702, 4242/65/79/98, 5232, 5618, 6115/45, 6684, 8464/9/86, 9420/57, 9671, 9710, 92221/9. Works Yard: 3682, 3797, 4690, 6108, 9489, 9639, 92238. |
SLS/196112 |
20/12/1964 |
Swindon Works (Turntable area) |
'A' Shop: D9525-9541, D603, D803/7/8/14, D820/7, D830, D853/9, D860/3/6, D1000/57, D3039, D3196, D3743/5/61, D3808/15, D3822, D6307/26/30/8/53, D7005/14, L95, 42975, 43003/12/112. Weigh House: D1037. 'C' Shop: 5257, 8401 remains. Triangle: 7023 in steam. Turntable area: 4659, 7782, 8405/9, 9425/57, 42945, 92223. Dump: 2818, 3685, 4626, 5264, 5602, 6010, 6824, 6873, 7327, 8418, 9484, 9752, 78009. |
SLS/196502 |
14/02/1965 |
Swindon Works (Turntable area) |
Erecting shop: D9532-46, 4079, D603, D800/1/25/53/66, D1019/34/48/69, D1746, D2238, D3105/96, D3260/8, D3355, D3604, D3750, D3947/80, D4016, PWM650. Weigh shop area: D807, D1017/38, D827, D4213, D6326/30, D7061. Dump: 2818, 3700/25, 3807/35, 5936/74, 6125, 6860, 6935. Triangle: 73093. Turntable area: 3253, 4659, 8405/9, 9425/57, 43003 ex Works. |
SLS/196503 |
09/05/1965 |
Swindon Works (Turntable area) |
'A' Shop: D603, D800/16/8/35/41/52/6/67, D0280, D2124/42, D3003, D3582/93, D3774, D3809/17/21/30/40, D3965, D4010, D6310/7, D7015/8/21/4/37/51, D9543-9554; Turntable area: 8405, 9425/57; Weigh shop: D854. Dump: 2818, 6412, 6969; 'C' Shop: 7910 remains of. |
SLS/196506 |
03/10/1965 |
Swindon Works (Dump) |
Erecting shop: D811/2/3/29/58/65/70, D1003/6/20/51/5, D1589, D1742, D2141, D3034/5/91, D3108/80, D3258, D3743/4/56, D3847, D3954, D4118, D6304/10/7/35, D7000/9/23, D9500/54/5. WD 878 (350 h.p. shunter). 1442 for restoration. Weigh shop area: D603, D863, D1013/53, D2569; Triangle: D3998, 8459; Turntable area: D3953, D9521; Dump: 2818, 6412, 9425/57. Cutting up, shop: 8405 remains. |
SLS/196511 |