|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/05/1961 | Swindon Works (Works Yard) | Gas Works: 4203, 5103/10/76, 9414. Stock Shed Yard: D817, D6319/21, 5815. Triangle: 1361/2/4, 1433, 1647, 3657/67/70/7, 3724, 5001, 6027, 6959, 8457, 8705, 9762. Works Yard: D804/38, D2144/88/91/6, D7000, 1029, 1501/2/9, 1604, 2516, 2884, 4090, 4950/72/8/85, 5022/97, 5949/58, 6004, 6937/62, 7007, 7221, 7304/40, 7761/75, 9400, 9749, 82031, 92226/45. Weigh House: D808, 4984. 'A' Shop: D602, D801/15/8/36/40/3/50/69/70, D1000-7, D2195/7-9, D2372-4, D3257, D6305/9, 3817, 4088, 4264/75, 4704, 4912/4/42/70/88/94, 5015/51/70/2/99, 5914/48/51/3/70/87, 6020, 6333/72, 6828/44/50, 6911/69/77/9, 7002/9/32/6, 7232/3, 13187, 13256/62, 15100/2, 82020/1, 92234. Dump: 1366, 1419/31/54/73, 2207/27, 3676, 5158/75/94, 5771/91, 6426, 7748, 8429, 8722/6/40/69/77, 9735/81. 'C' Shop: 5207, 8101. Field: 78001/8. | SLS/196107 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1932 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 9318 Built at Swindon Works |
||
01/01/1934 | Allocation | |||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Reading (W.R.) (RDG) | ||
16/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Oxley (84B) | ||
09/10/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F) | ||
29/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Worcester (85A) | ||
25/02/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) | ||
16/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neyland (87H) | ||
31/12/1957 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 7340 | ||
19/05/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neyland (87H) | ||
16/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) | ||
11/08/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neyland (87H) | ||
06/10/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G) | ||
17/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Didcot (81E) | ||
15/06/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 7340 |