Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1431 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19234 Week
» 72250 Month
» 191777 Year
» 3218630 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
92224 |
on |
16/06/1958 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/06/1958 |
Banbury MPD |
The latest batch of 9F 2-10-0's for the W.R. ex Crewe are being allocated here in place of LMR 8F 2-8-0's which are being returned to the L.M.R. and replacing G.W.R. types at Chester (W.R.) depot. By 28th June of ten 9F's allocated, 92221/2/3/4/5 had arrived and all these are fitted with early type tender and are working iron-ore trains to and from South Wales. |
SLS/195807 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/06/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 92224 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Banbury (84C) |
|
|
11/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
16/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxford (81F) |
|
|
31/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (82F) |
|
|
28/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E) |
|
|
02/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88A) |
|
|
01/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Banbury (2D) |
|
|
13/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 92224 |
|
|
06/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |
|
|