Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 875 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14281 Week
» 67297 Month
» 186824 Year
» 3213677 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
92158 |
on |
30/11/1957 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
16G |
Westhouses |
5w/e |
12/10/1963 |
ALLOC |
8C |
Speke Junction |
5w/e |
11/07/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
23/07/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
05/07/1964 |
Derby MPD |
Awaiting Works: D1688. Ex Works: D1749, D1750, D5282/3/4, D5794, 12031/79. Also on 16C. D2859, 92071/158/81/239, 90579/652. Stored: 44172/333, 45585. |
SLS/196408 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/11/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 92158 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
21/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westhouses (16G) |
|
|
13/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
23/07/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 92158 |
|
|
11/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|